Global Patent Index - EP 0821755 B1

EP 0821755 B1 2000-11-29 - VAPOUR BARRIER FOR USE IN THE HEAT INSULATION OF BUILDINGS

Title (en)

VAPOUR BARRIER FOR USE IN THE HEAT INSULATION OF BUILDINGS

Title (de)

DAMPFBREMSE FÜR DEN EINSATZ ZUR WÄRMEDÄMMUNG VON GEBÄUDEN

Title (fr)

BARRIERE DE VAPEUR SERVANT A ISOLER DES BATIMENTS CONTRE LES EFFETS DE LA CHALEUR

Publication

EP 0821755 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909977 A

Priority

  • DE 9600705 W
  • DE 19514420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633321A1] The invention relates to a vapour barrier for use in the heat insulation of buildings, especially for use in new buildings and the renovation of old ones. The vapour barrier of the invention can effect water vapour exchange in various environmental conditions. This is accomplished by the use as the essential material of a material having a water vapour diffusion resistance depending on the environmental humidity and also had adequate tensile and tear strength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/66; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/34 (2006.01); E04B 1/66 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01); E04F 13/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/66 (2013.01); E04D 12/002 (2013.01); E04D 13/16 (2013.01); B65H 2301/36 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1313 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633321 A1 19961024; AT 197832 T 20001215; AU 5331896 A 19961107; AU 695567 B2 19980813; BR 9608141 A 19990209; CA 2215502 A1 19961024; CA 2215502 C 20050830; CN 1082122 C 20020403; CN 1185821 A 19980624; CZ 292207 B6 20030813; CZ 9703218 A3 19980218; DE 19514420 C1 19970306; DE 59606169 D1 20010104; DK 0821755 T3 20010305; EA 000491 B1 19990826; EA 199700245 A1 19980625; EE 03622 B1 20020215; EE 9700246 A 19980415; EP 0821755 A1 19980204; EP 0821755 B1 20001129; ES 2153958 T3 20010316; HU 221558 B 20021128; HU 9802610 A2 19990329; HU 9802610 A3 20000128; JP 4471403 B2 20100602; JP H11504088 A 19990406; KR 100417903 B1 20040128; KR 19980703897 A 19981205; MX 9707769 A 19980628; NO 308548 B1 20000925; NO 974807 A 19971219; NO 974807 D0 19971017; NZ 305338 A 19981223; PL 188198 B1 20041231; PL 322730 A1 19980216; RO 116102 B1 20001030; SI 821755 T1 20010630; SK 142097 A3 19980204; SK 284896 B6 20060202; TR 9701201 T1 19980221

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150419

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 197832 T

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-06-01 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160417

2016-04-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606169

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150418

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150418

2015-11-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20150418

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150410

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030915

2004-02-04 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER

2003-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B.I. MOLL GMBH & CO. KG

2001-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OEKOLOGISCHE BAUSYSTEME B.I. MOLL GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153958 T3

2001-03-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606169 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970924;LV PAYMENT 19970924;SI PAYMENT 19970924

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197832 T 20001215

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970924

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1998-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970924;LV PAYMENT 970924;SI PAYMENT 970924