Global Patent Index - EP 0821765 B1

EP 0821765 B1 2000-07-05 - CHARGING VALVE ARRANGEMENT TO CHARGE A STORE

Title (en)

CHARGING VALVE ARRANGEMENT TO CHARGE A STORE

Title (de)

LADEVENTILANORDNUNG ZUM LADEN EINES SPEICHERS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SOUPAPE DE CHARGEMENT UTILISE POUR CHARGER UN ACCUMULATEUR

Publication

EP 0821765 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96908107 A

Priority

  • DE 19514745 A
  • EP 9601245 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19514745A1] The proposal is for a charging valve arrangement with a pilot valve which can be connected to a pump and a store and in a first position connected the pump to the store and in a second separates the pump from the store. The separation of the pump and the store takes place at a given storage pressure limit and a user connected to the system is cut off in such a way that the user's load pressure does not act on the store. The pressure from the pump and/or the store is applied to a control valve to regulate the pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 1/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 1/02 (2006.01); F15B 1/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19514745 A1 19961024; EP 0821765 A1 19980204; EP 0821765 B1 20000705; JP H11509294 A 19990817; US 6000219 A 19991214; WO 9633346 A1 19961024

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150321

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150321

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605549

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605549 20000810

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981228

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971020

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE