Global Patent Index - EP 0822016 B1

EP 0822016 B1 2002-09-11 - Method for producing bimetallic material

Title (en)

Method for producing bimetallic material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines bimetallischen Materials

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau bimétallique

Publication

EP 0822016 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97660073 A

Priority

FI 962628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822016A1] The invention relates to a method for producing bimetallic material in a continuously operated extrusion machine (3), in which method the bimetallic components (1, 2) are fed together into the extrusion zone. According to the invention, the bimetallic material (1, 2) to be extruded is made to flow in an essentially laminar fashion throughout the extrusion, and the bimetallic material (1, 2) is made to be discharged from the extrusion machine (3) in an essentially radial direction with respect to the outer circumference of the feeding device (4) of the extrusion machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/00; B21C 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/00 (2006.01); B21C 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/005 (2013.01); B21C 23/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822016 A1 19980204; EP 0822016 B1 20020911; DE 69715332 D1 20021017; DE 69715332 T2 20030522; FI 101457 B1 19980630; FI 101457 B 19980630; FI 962628 A0 19960626; FI 962628 A 19971227

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715332 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000504

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI