Global Patent Index - EP 0822101 B1

EP 0822101 B1 2001-12-19 - Wallpapering aid

Title (en)

Wallpapering aid

Title (de)

Tapezierhilfsmittel

Title (fr)

Appareil à préparer la tapisserie

Publication

EP 0822101 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97305619 A

Priority

GB 9616375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822101A1] The wallpapering aid (1) is for use in conjunction with a roll of wallpaper and is mountable on a pasting table. A roll holder (6,7) supports the roll of wallpaper above the level of the paper and a cutting arrangement enables the wallpaper to be cut to a desired size. The cutting arrangement has an elongate guide (11) arranged to lie adjacent the working surface of the pasting table, and a cutter (15) guided to move along the guide, the cutter has a captive portion movable along and retained by the guide and a blade projecting upwardly from the captive portion for cutting to length wallpaper overlaying the guide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 7/02; B26D 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/04 (2006.01); B44C 7/02 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/045 (2013.01); B44C 7/025 (2013.01); B65H 35/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822101 A1 19980204; EP 0822101 B1 20011219; DE 69709262 D1 20020131; GB 2316038 A 19980218; GB 2316038 B 20000809; GB 9616375 D0 19960911

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-07-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-03-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709262 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB