Global Patent Index - EP 0822142 B1

EP 0822142 B1 2000-04-05 - Flap folding apparatus in packaging machine

Title (en)

Flap folding apparatus in packaging machine

Title (de)

Klappenfaltvorrichtung in einer Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage d'un rabat dans une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 0822142 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96111821 A

Priority

EP 96111821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822142A1] The present invention relates to a body flap folding apparatus in a packaging machine. Comb-shaped folding pieces (6, 7) are moved pivotally along arcuate tracks (T2, T1) from edge portions (A6, A7) of a folding surface (A5) of box-like contents (A). As a result, front ends (6a, 7a) of the folding pieces (6, 7) strike against body flaps (B2, B1) at the edge portions (A6, A7), whereby the base portions of the body flaps (B2, B1) are bent along the edge portions (A6, A7). Thereafter, resilient members (6c, 7c) are deformed in the direction opposite to their biasing direction by virtue of a reaction force from the folding surface (A5) , so that the folding pieces (6, 7) fold the body flaps (B2, B1) inside along the folding surface (A5) in a strained state of the flaps. Further, even if with return movement of the folding piece (6) for the inner body flap (B2) the inner body flap (B2) once folded tries to return in the direction opposite to the folding direction under the action of friction created between the folding piece (6) and the inner body flap (B2), the base end thereof strikes against a comb-shaped front end portion (2a) of a second holding face (2) to prevent return of the inner body flap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/30; B65B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2006.01); B65B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2013.01); B65B 49/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822142 A1 19980204; EP 0822142 B1 20000405; DE 69607605 D1 20000511; DE 69607605 T2 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020723

2003-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010718

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607605 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. FERRAROTTI GIOVANNI

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980425

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT