Global Patent Index - EP 0822158 B1

EP 0822158 B1 2004-12-29 - System for automatically positioning a movable object in relation to another movable object

Title (en)

System for automatically positioning a movable object in relation to another movable object

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum automatischen Positionieren eines von zwei gegeneinander beweglichen Objekten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour positionner automatiquement un objet mobile par rapport à un autre objet mobile

Publication

EP 0822158 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112698 A

Priority

DE 19630187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822158A1] The method involves surveying a destination location using at least one master measuring system e.g. a camera (5) which travels freely at least one axis, and at least one mark located at one side of a transport facility (1). The camera respectively delivers object position to a slave (10) e.g. a laser scanner. The camera is either itself an object mark for the slave or positions a corresponding object mark for the slave. The slave determines the position of the object mark and positions the load reception facility e.g. a spreader (14) with or without goods opposite the object mark set by the master. The load reception facility travels in to the required position, for the reception or the discharge of goods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/00; B66C 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19630187 A1 19980129; DE 19630187 C2 20010322; EP 0822158 A1 19980204; EP 0822158 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060612

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-11-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANES GMBH

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NOELL CRANE SYSTEMS GMBH

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANES GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANES GMBH

2005-02-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NOELL CRANE SYSTEMS GMBH

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712144 P 20050203

2004-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANE G.M.B.H.ALBERT-EINST

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *NOELL MOBILE SYSTEMS & CRANE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040227

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOELL CRANE SYSTEMS GMBH

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT NL

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

1998-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOELL STAHL- UND MASCHINENBAU GMBH

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980224

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

1998-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI