Global patent index - EP 0822246 B1

EP 0822246 B1 2000-10-04 - Lubricating oil composition

Title (en)

Lubricating oil composition

Title (de)

Schmierölzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante

Publication

EP 0822246 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97305728 A

Priority

JP 22046296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822246A2] The present invention is a lubricating oil, especially a lubricating oil for internal combustion engines, which has friction-reducing properties even under sliding conditions varying substantially in internal combustion engines and the like and which can retain friction-reducing properties over an extend even in the presence of nitrogen oxide gas. The lubricating oil composition contains a lubricating base oil, and an organomolybdenum compound, an organomono-sulfide compound, and an organopolysulfide compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 135/00; C10M 141/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/12 (2006.01); C10M 135/00 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 135/00 (2013.01); C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 2203/06 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/04 (2013.01); C10M 2205/06 (2013.01); C10M 2205/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/144 (2013.01); C10M 2207/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/106 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2219/00 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/062 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/083 (2013.01); C10M 2219/084 (2013.01); C10M 2219/085 (2013.01); C10M 2219/086 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2260/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 135/00 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 135/14 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/26 + C10M 135/26 + C10M 135/28 + C10M 135/28 + C10M 135/30 + C10M 135/36
  2. C10M 141/10 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 135/14 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/26 + C10M 135/28 + C10M 135/30 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 137/10
  3. C10M 163/00 + C10M 135/14 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/26 + C10M 135/28 + C10M 135/30 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/22 + C10M 159/24
  4. C10M 2219/083 + C10M 2219/083
  5. C10M 2219/085 + C10M 2219/085
  6. C10M 2219/086 + C10M 2219/086
  7. C10M 2223/045 + C10M 2223/045

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822246 A2 19980204; EP 0822246 A3 19980415; EP 0822246 B1 20001004; AU 3242197 A 19980212; AU 718688 B2 20000420; CA 2210974 A1 19980202; CA 2210974 C 20040914; DE 69703226 D1 20001109; DE 69703226 T2 20010315; ES 2153161 T3 20010216; JP 3497952 B2 20040216; JP H1046177 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TONEN CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040730

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TONEN CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-08-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030811

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030703

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153161

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703226

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-09

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991118

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980909

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE