Global Patent Index - EP 0822276 B1

EP 0822276 B1 2000-11-02 - Device for controlling the air stream in a open-end spinning device

Title (en)

Device for controlling the air stream in a open-end spinning device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Luftstromes in einer Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler le courant d'air dans un métier à filer à bout ouvert

Publication

EP 0822276 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111818 A

Priority

DE 19631234 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822276A1] Apparatus to control an air stream in an open-end (OE) spinning unit has an opening cylinder(3) in a first casing chamber (32) for opening sliver ribbon (1) into individual fibres for feeding via a connecting supply channel (30) to be gathered on a collecting surface in a rotor running in a second chamber. At least one air feed channel (84), with a connector aperture (830), discharges into either chamber or their connecting channel. An air-line (98) service terminal (980) on a service trolley (9) which traverses several OE-spinning units can be applied to the connector aperture which pivots a defined amount under action of a device connected to a trolley-based controller (92). A flexible intermediate section (981, 840) is connected either to air feed channel or air-line so that the service terminal is free to move relative to either and can follow the motion of the connector aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/34 (2006.01); D01H 4/08 (2006.01); D01H 4/24 (2006.01); D01H 4/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822276 A1 19980204; EP 0822276 B1 20001102; CZ 9702364 A3 19980218; DE 19631234 A1 19980205; SK 103197 A3 19980506; US 5916119 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2004-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702559 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981102

1998-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALK, JOHANN

1998-12-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREIS, DIETMAR

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980520

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1998-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI