Global Patent Index - EP 0822284 B1

EP 0822284 B1 2000-11-02 - Nonwoven fabric and device for making the same

Title (en)

Nonwoven fabric and device for making the same

Title (de)

Spinnvliesstoff und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Matériau non-tissé et dispositif de fabrication

Publication

EP 0822284 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108067 A

Priority

DE 19630523 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822284A2] A spun-bonded web comprises monofilaments of polyethylene terephthalate and bi-component filaments of polyethylene terephthalate and a binding polymer material in the form of at least two externally facing segments (2), the content by weight of bi-component filaments varying over the web cross-section from 1 to 100%. This ratio changes through the cross-section planes of the web without noticeable phase boundaries. Also claimed is apparatus for producing the web. It comprises 1 to 40 rectangular spinneret plates (3) or circular discs placed above a drafting device for the filaments leaving the spinneret holes (5), (6), where some holes (5) eject bi-component filaments and others (6) mono-filaments from the smelt. Below the drafting device is a horizontally moving collecting belt on which plane, as viewed in the travel direction, the filaments are projected in an arranged sequence which corresponds to the concentration gradation of the filament mixture in vertical cross-section. I.e. a filament mixture is first laid down which forms an externally facing web surface, subsequently internal web layers are formed in sequence and finally the other externally facing surface layer, all smoothly merging one with another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/14; D01D 5/34; D04H 3/16; D05C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/02 (2006.01); D04H 3/011 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 3/147 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/011 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 3/147 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01); Y10T 442/60 (2015.04); Y10T 442/608 (2015.04); Y10T 442/609 (2015.04); Y10T 442/638 (2015.04); Y10T 442/64 (2015.04); Y10T 442/681 (2015.04); Y10T 442/69 (2015.04); Y10T 442/697 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822284 A2 19980204; EP 0822284 A3 19980415; EP 0822284 B1 20001102; DE 19630523 C1 19980312; JP 2813585 B2 19981022; JP H10102370 A 19980421; KR 100225312 B1 19991015; MX 9705700 A 19980228; PL 184174 B1 20020930; PL 321389 A1 19980202; TW 348191 B 19981221; US 6053719 A 20000425; US 6274521 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140517

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140517

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702560

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140517

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702560

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2003-04-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-06-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-04-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COLBOND BV

2001-08-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COLBOND BV

- Effective date: 20010707

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702560 20001207

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000412

1998-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE