Global Patent Index - EP 0822299 B1

EP 0822299 B1 2002-11-27 - Connecting element

Title (en)

Connecting element

Title (de)

Verbindungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de liaison

Publication

EP 0822299 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112119 A

Priority

CH 189796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822299A1] The rigid plate (2) is resistant to bending loads and transmits torque, tension-, compression- and shear-loads between concrete components separated by a seam. Thickened bodies (3,4) are solidly fixed to the plate (2) at the top and bottom, the plate thickness (D) being at the most equal to those (B,B') of the bodies. The plate length (L) is at the most equal to the seam width (E). The top body (3) has an extension (3') at one side beyond the plate in the lengthwise direction of the plate, while the bottom one (4) has a similar extension in the opposite direction. Anchoring devices on the extensions can form further extensions, and each body can be integral with its extension and anchoring device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822299 A1 19980204; EP 0822299 B1 20021127; AT 228599 T 20021215; DE 59708804 D1 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160716

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228599 T

- Effective date: 20160716

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150710

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708804

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708804

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BASYS AG

2003-03-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BASYS AG

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708804 20030109

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INDUSTRIEBERATUNG MAIER AG

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228599 T 20021215

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991209

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI NL

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980310

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL