Global Patent Index - EP 0822321 B1

EP 0822321 B1 2002-09-18 - Method for slowing down a 4 stroke internal combustion engine, in particular, when used for vehicle propulsion

Title (en)

Method for slowing down a 4 stroke internal combustion engine, in particular, when used for vehicle propulsion

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abbremsen einer Viertakt-Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere für den Antrieb eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Procédé pour ralentir un moteur à combustion interne à 4 temps, en particulier, lors d'une utilisation pour l'entraînement d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0822321 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97102964 A

Priority

DE 19614923 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19614923A1] The method enabling rapid deceleration of the four stroke IC engine involves using additional combustion stages during the compression stage and before reaching TDC. This combustion is controlled to generate the required amount of engine braking and is terminated well before TDC. Each cylinder has at least one exhaust valve operated in the special mode. Controlled amounts of fuel are injected for the braking combustion. For diesel engines the fuel injection can be accompanied by a glow plug, or spark assistance. The engine braking is activated by an emergency stop control and/or by emergency braking of the vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/06; F02D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/06 (2006.01); F02D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 13/04 (2013.01); F01L 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19614923 A1 19971023; DE 19614923 C2 19990506; EP 0822321 A1 19980204; EP 0822321 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708241 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUMSER, SIEGFRIED

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, ERWIN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HANAUER, HORST

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUMEZ, WERNER, DR.

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, EBERHARD

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970819

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT