Global Patent Index - EP 0822330 B1

EP 0822330 B1 2001-05-30 - Fuel supply system for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel supply system for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Brennstoffversorgungssystem für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en carburant pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0822330 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105983 A

Priority

DE 19627579 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822330A2] The baffle pot in the fuel tank forms the accumulator whose capacity is limited by a spring-loaded (10) piston (11), using a piston travel switch (12) in a pot as a pressure switch. The accumulating space (9) is connected to the fuel delivery line (7) from pump to distributor bar by an electrical cutoff switch (13), and the piston spring (10) coaxially surrounds the fuel pump (1). Baffle (2), pump and accumulator space (9) are joined to one another in modular arrangement, screwed together by tie-bolt screws, and installed all together in the baffle pot. Fuel is passed from pump and reducer via line (21) and switch (13) to the accumulating space (22), so when the piston moves against its spring the fuel line pressure exceeds that imposed by the reduction regulator to build fuel at working pressure on the bar (7). At capacity, piston moves the switch (12) into the open setting thus de-energising the pump until the accumulator capacity is sufficiently lowered and the fuelling cycle recommences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2013.01); F02M 37/103 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 29509774 U1 19950914 - PIERBURG GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19627579 A1 19980115; EP 0822330 A2 19980204; EP 0822330 A3 19980318; EP 0822330 B1 20010530; ES 2157496 T3 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040412

2005-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040412

2004-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2003-06-13 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2003-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157496 T3

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703650 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000203

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970411

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT