Global patent index - EP 0822470 B1

EP 0822470 B1 2000-10-11 - Electronic timepiece comprising a generator driven by a barrel spring

Title (en)

Electronic timepiece comprising a generator driven by a barrel spring

Title (de)

Elektronisches Uhrwerk, das einen Generator enthält, der von einer Zugfeder getrieben wird

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie électronique comportant une génératrice entrainée par un barillet à ressort

Publication

EP 0822470 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97112585 A

Priority

FR 9609747 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822470A1] A spring barrel (5,6) drives a magnetic rotor (2) adjacent to a winding (3) constituting a generator (1). A wheel train (4) connects hour,minute and second hands (7,8,9) to the spring and rotor. The generator (1) is connected to an integrated circuit (11) through a rectifier (10). A quartz crystal (12) and frequency divider (13) form a reference time base whose output is fed to a reversible counter (16) with the generator output (19) after comparison with earth (17,18). The counter output is analysed by a logic unit (20) which controls a generator short circuiting transistor (22) and power on reset circuit (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822470 A1 19980204; EP 0822470 B1 20001011; CN 1108544 C 20030514; CN 1176415 A 19980318; DE 69703275 D1 20001116; DE 69703275 T2 20010517; FR 2752070 A1 19980206; FR 2752070 B1 19980918; HK 1009530 A1 20040220; JP 4383551 B2 20091216; JP H1082870 A 19980331; SG 60087 A1 19990222; US 5751666 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010102

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703275

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991118

1998-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980804

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI