Global Patent Index - EP 0822760 B1

EP 0822760 B1 2003-06-18 - CIGARETTE AND HEATER FOR USE IN AN ELECTRICAL SMOKING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CIGARETTE AND HEATER FOR USE IN AN ELECTRICAL SMOKING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZIGARETTE UND HEIZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES RAUCHSYSTEM

Title (fr)

CIGARETTE ET DISPOSITIF CHAUFFANT DESTINES A UN SYSTEME ELECTRIQUE SERVANT A FUMER

Publication

EP 0822760 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96912902 A

Priority

  • US 9605417 W
  • US 42516695 A
  • US 42583795 A
  • US 42616595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632854A2] A cigarette (23) comprises a tobacco rod having filled and unfilled portions arranged so that electrical heater elements (31) may overlap both portions. The rod includes a tubular tobacco web. The web is constructed by converting tobacco feedstock into a continuous sheet of tobacco web and converting the continuous sheet of tobacco web into one or ore bobbins of tobacco web suitable for automated manufacture of cigarettes. A heater (25) comprises a supporting hub and electrically resistive heater blades (37) defining a receptacle (27) for an inserted cigarette (23). Each blade comprises first and second heater blade legs each having a first end and a second end, and a connecting section connecting the second end of the first leg and the first end of the second leg. The blades (37) are heated by a resistive heating circuit and heat the inserted cigarette (23). The legs are separated by a gap to permit entrainment of flavour substances upon drawing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24F 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/00 (2006.01); A24F 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24F 47/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632854 A2 19961024; WO 9632854 A3 19970123; AR 002035 A1 19980107; AT 242980 T 20030715; AU 5565196 A 19961107; AU 711837 B2 19991021; BR 9608201 A 19990406; CA 2218595 A1 19961024; CA 2218595 C 20050315; CN 1113620 C 20030709; CN 1190335 A 19980812; DE 69628745 D1 20030724; DE 69628745 T2 20040422; DK 0822760 T3 20031013; DO P1996005265 A 20010716; DZ 2022 A1 20020721; EA 000244 B1 19990225; EA 199700332 A1 19980430; EP 0822760 A2 19980211; EP 0822760 B1 20030618; ES 2202437 T3 20040401; HR P960185 A2 19971231; HU 228654 B1 20130528; HU 9800981 A2 19980828; HU 9800981 A3 19990830; JP 3996188 B2 20071024; JP H11503912 A 19990406; MA 23846 A1 19961231; MX 9708035 A 19980228; MY 119710 A 20050729; NO 317865 B1 20041227; NO 974712 A 19971222; NO 974712 D0 19971010; NZ 306882 A 19990528; OA 10628 A 20010424; PL 182701 B1 20020228; PL 182861 B1 20020329; PL 324378 A1 19980525; PT 822760 E 20031128; RO 120750 B1 20060728; SK 142597 A3 19981104; SK 284345 B6 20050204; TR 199701210 T1 19980321; TW 318780 B 19971101

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160427

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-07-15 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20030403637

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 242980 T

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-06-01 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160418

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-04-25 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-04-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-04-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69628745

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150416

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150416

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS INC.

- Free text: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS INC.#3601 COMMERCE ROAD#RICHMOND VIRGINIA 23234 (US) -TRANSFER TO- PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS INC.#3601 COMMERCE ROAD#RICHMOND VIRGINIA 23234 (US)

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-03-17 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202437 T3

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403637

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628745 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV SI

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 971031;LV PAYMENT 971031;SI PAYMENT 971031