Global Patent Index - EP 0822887 B1

EP 0822887 B1 2000-11-02 - MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A BOARD- OR PANEL-SHAPED WOODEN ELEMENT

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A BOARD- OR PANEL-SHAPED WOODEN ELEMENT

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN HOLZSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE POUR PRODUIRE DES ELEMENTS DE BOIS EN FORME DE PLANCHES OU DE PANNEAUX

Publication

EP 0822887 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96912356 A

Priority

  • SE 9600378 W
  • SE 9501552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633849A1] A machine for producing a wooden element made up of parallel rows of bars comprises a tape-applying device (15, 17, 18, 19) intended for such application of a strip of adhesive tape (16) on pairs of adjacent rows in parallel therewith that the strip of adhesive tape (16) joins the rows together, as well as a cutting device (23) intended to cut the material web made up of the thus-joined bar rows into predetermined lengths. The cutting device (23) has a reciprocatingly movable carriage (24) provided with a rear cutting unit (32) and a front stop element (37), the distance between the latter being adjustable according to the aimed-at cutting length. When fed forwards, the material web impinges upon the stop element (37), thereby to displace the carriage (24) from an initial position to a turning position. The cutting unit (32) performs a cutting operation during this displacement of the carriage (24). Before the carriage (24) reaches its turning position, the stop element (37) is removed in order to release the cut-off length of material web, thus enabling it to be discharged from the machine. A discharge conveyor (26) discharges the cut-off length of material web at a speed exceeding that at which the material web is fed in the remainder of the machine. A return element (41) returns the carriage (24) to its initial position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/60 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01); B27M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/006 (2013.01); B26D 1/605 (2013.01); B27M 1/08 (2013.01); Y10T 156/12 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1374 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1717 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633849 A1 19961031; AT 197262 T 20001115; AU 5519196 A 19961118; CA 2218748 A1 19961031; DE 69610831 D1 20001207; DE 69610831 T2 20010607; DK 0822887 T3 20010212; EP 0822887 A1 19980211; EP 0822887 B1 20001102; ES 2152020 T3 20010116; GR 3035095 T3 20010330; NO 309415 B1 20010129; NO 974894 A 19971208; NO 974894 D0 19971023; PT 822887 E 20010430; SE 505907 C2 19971020; SE 9501552 D0 19950427; SE 9501552 L 19961028; US 5938886 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070326

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TARKETT A.B.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070403

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-06 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-06 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-02-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152020 T3

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610831 20001207

2000-12-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197262 T 20001115

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971007

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE