Global patent index - EP 0822902 B1

EP 0822902 B1 2000-01-26 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CURING U/V PRINTING INKS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CURING U/V PRINTING INKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HÄRTEN VON UV-DRUCKFARBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DURCIR DES ENCRES D'IMPRIMERIE PAR U.V.

Publication

EP 0822902 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96914049 A

Priority

  • DE 9600767 W
  • DE 19515462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633872A1] The invention relates to a process and a device for curing a u/v hardening printing ink (4) on a printed material (9) in which the printing ink (14) is irradiated with u/v light from a u/v radiation source (8). A low-pressure gas discharge lamp (7) is proposed as the u/v radiation source (8). A further special feature of the device of the invention is that it has a fixed reflector (5) comprising in particular a special reflecting coating of a diffusely reflective material based on a silicone rubber with diffusely reflective particles embedded therein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/02 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); C09D 11/02 (2006.01); G02B 5/08 (2006.01); G02B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 7/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633872 A1 19961031; EP 0822902 A1 19980211; EP 0822902 B1 20000126; JP H11509788 A 19990831; US 2001009701 A1 20010726; US 6280801 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100425

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: METRONIC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free Format Text: METRONIC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#BENZSTRASSE 11#97209 VEITSHOECHHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- METRONIC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#BENZSTRASSE 11#97209 VEITSHOECHHEIM (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: METRONIC GERAETEBAU GMBH & CO. TRANSFER- METRONIC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB IT LI

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990301

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB IT LI