Global Patent Index - EP 0822980 A4

EP 0822980 A4 2000-04-26 - RECOMBINANT INFECTIOUS LARYNGOTRACHEITIS VIRUS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

RECOMBINANT INFECTIOUS LARYNGOTRACHEITIS VIRUS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

REKOMBINANTES INFEKTIÖSES LARYNGOTRACHEITISVIRUS UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

VIRUS DE LA LARYNGOTRACHEITE INFECTIEUSE RECOMBINE ET SES UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 0822980 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96910515 A

Priority

  • US 9603916 W
  • US 41012195 A
  • US 46819095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629396A1] The present invention provides a recombinant, attenuated infectious laryngotracheitis virus comprising the infectious laryngotracheitis viral genome which contains a deletion in the glycoprotein gG gene. This attenuated virus is useful as a vaccine against infectious laryngotracheitis virus. The present invention also provides a recombinant, attenuated infectious laryngotracheitis virus comprising the infectious laryngotracheitis viral genome which contains a deletion in the US2 gene, UL47-like gene, ORF4 gene or glycoprotein g60 gene. The present invention also provides a method for distinguishing chickens or other poultry vaccinated with a recombinant infectious laryngotracheitis virus which produces no glycoprotein gG from those infected with a naturally-occuring infectious laryngotracheitis virus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 7/00; A61K 39/245; A61K 39/295; C12N 7/01; C12N 15/38; C12N 15/86; G01N 33/564; G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/215 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07K 14/03 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PXL] WO 9508622 A1 19950330 - SYNTRO CORP [US]
  • [A] KONGUSUWAN K. ET AL.: "Nucleotide sequence analysis of an infectious layngotracheitis virus gene corresponding to the US3 of HSV-1 and a unique gene encoding a 67 kDa protein.", ARCH. VIROL., vol. 140, no. 1, January 1995 (1995-01-01), pages 27 - 39, XP000877135
  • [AD] GUO P. ET AL.: "Construction of recombinant avian infectious laryngotracheitis virus expressing the beta-galactosidase gene and DNA sequencing of the insertion region", VIROLOGY, vol. 202, 1994, pages 771 - 781, XP002131399
  • [A] ZELNIK V. ET AL.: "The complete sequence and gene organization of the short unique region of herpesviru of turkeys", J. GEN. VIROL., vol. 74, 1993, pages 2151 - 2162, XP002131400
  • [PA] WILD M A ET AL: "A GENOMIC MAP OF INFECTIOUS LARYNGOTRACHEITIS VIRUS AND THE SEQUENCE AND ORGANIZATION OF GENES PRESENT IN THE UNIQUE SHORT AND FLANKING REGIONS", VIRUS GENES,US,KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, vol. 12, no. 2, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), pages 107 - 116, XP000645840, ISSN: 0920-8569
  • See also references of WO 9629396A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629396 A1 19960926; AU 5369096 A 19961008; AU 721451 B2 20000706; CA 2216139 A1 19960926; CA 2216139 C 20130108; EP 0822980 A1 19980211; EP 0822980 A4 20000426; JP 3964458 B2 20070822; JP H11503009 A 19990323

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2000-04-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE