Global Patent Index - EP 0822984 A4

EP 0822984 A4 2000-05-03 - HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (en)

HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (de)

REZEPTOR FÜR HUMANEN TUMOR NEKROSIS FAKTOR

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS DU FACTEUR DE NECROSE TUMORALE CHEZ L'HOMME

Publication

EP 0822984 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95917662 A

Priority

US 9505058 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9634095A1] A human TNF receptor polypeptide and two splice variants thereof and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptides and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such receptor polypeptides for screening for antagonists and agonists to the receptors and for ligands for the receptors. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such agonists to inhibit the growth of tumors, to stimulate cellular differentiation, to mediate the immune response and anti-viral response, to regulate growth and provide resistance to certain infections. The use of the antagonists as a therapeutic to treat autoimmune diseases, inflammation, septic shock, to inhibit graft-host reactions, and to prevent apoptosis is also disclosed. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting mutations in the nucleic acid sequences and the polypeptides encoded thereby.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/28; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/525; C12P 21/06; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/525 (2006.01); C07K 14/715 (2006.01); C12N 15/28 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/7151 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0393438 A2 19901024 - BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]
  • [X] C A SMITH ET AL: "A receptor for tumor necrosis factor defines an unusual family of cellular and viral proteins", SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, vol. 248, no. 248, 25 May 1990 (1990-05-25), pages 1019 - 1022-1023, XP002107350, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • [T] KWON B S ET AL: "A newly identified member of the tumor necrosis factor receptor superfamily with a wide tissue distribution and involvement in lymphocyte activation.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997 MAY 30) 272 (22) 14272-6., XP002131224
  • See also references of WO 9634095A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9634095 A1 19961031; AU 2363695 A 19961118; EP 0822984 A1 19980211; EP 0822984 A4 20000503; EP 2017337 A1 20090121; JP H11507205 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080827

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971119

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE