Global Patent Index - EP 0823158 A4

EP 0823158 A4 2001-04-25 - A TRAFFIC SHAPING ATM NETWORK SWITCH

Title (en)

A TRAFFIC SHAPING ATM NETWORK SWITCH

Title (de)

NETZWERKVERMITTLUNG MIT VERKEHRSFORMUNG

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR DE RESEAU ATM A AMENAGEMENT DE TRAFIC

Publication

EP 0823158 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96913033 A

Priority

  • GB 9508225 A
  • GB 9509483 A
  • US 9605606 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9634469A1] An ATM network switch includes a switch fabric (14), and a plurality of slot controllers (11) coupled to the switch fabric. Each slot controller has at least one external data link (12, 13), cell receiving circuitry (21) for receiving ATM cells from the data link and cell transmitting circuitry (22) for transmitting ATM cells outwardly on the data link. The cell transmitting circuitry of each slot controller includes traffic shaping circuitry (23) arranged to set, for each cell presented to the transmitting circuitry, a current onward transmission time where onward transmission at the input rate meets a predetermined flow rate criterion, and a delayed onward transmission time where onward transmission at the current time would cause the traffic on a VC to exceed a predetermined flow rate criterion. The traffic shaping circuitry includes a buffer (24) which stores each new cell at an address corresponding to the onward transmission time, and output logic (32 or 44) for outputting cells from the buffer at a time corresponding to the address thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04J 3/16; H04J 3/22; H04J 3/24; H04L 12/56; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/931 (2013.01); H04L 12/935 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 49/503 (2013.01); H04L 49/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] JONATHAN CHAO H: "A GENERAL ARCHITECTURE FOR LINK-LAYER CONGESTION CONTROL IN ATM NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM,JP,TOKYO, IEICE, vol. SYMP. 14, 25 October 1992 (1992-10-25), pages 229 - 233, XP000337649
  • [Y] BOYER P E ET AL: "THE SPACER-CONTROLLER: AN EFFICIENT UPC/NPC FOR ATM NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM,JP,TOKYO, IEICE, vol. SYMP. 14, 25 October 1992 (1992-10-25), pages 316 - 320, XP000337736
  • See also references of WO 9634469A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9634469 A1 19961031; AU 5565796 A 19961118; CA 2215722 A1 19961031; EP 0823158 A1 19980211; EP 0823158 A4 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030327

2001-04-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04J 3/16 A, 7H 04J 3/22 B, 7H 04J 3/24 B, 7H 04Q 11/04 B, 7H 04L 12/56 B

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971117

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB