Global Patent Index - EP 0823228 B1

EP 0823228 B1 2001-01-03 - Device for applying make-up on the lips

Title (en)

Device for applying make-up on the lips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schminken der Lippen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le maquillage des lèvres

Publication

EP 0823228 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401688 A

Priority

FR 9610018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823228A1] An applicator for coating the lips (L), e.g. with a cosmetic or protective product (1), consists of a support (2) with at least part of its surface designed to be impregnated with the product in a powder, liquid or paste form. The support is flat in shape and has a surface which deforms elastically under the pressure of the lips as it transfers a coating of the product to them. The support is made, for example, from a foam material with open or closed cells, or have surfaces (4,6) covered with a non-woven or flock material. It is also equipped with a gripper (8) to hold it by, and it can be inserted between applications into a container with inner linings which re-coat the support with the product in readiness for the next application. In a variant of the design the support can be in the form of a flat disc which rotates in a container of the product, presenting a newly-coated surface on its emerging portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/26 (2013.01); A45D 40/261 (2013.01); A45D 40/0087 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1018 (2013.01); A45D 2200/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823228 A1 19980211; EP 0823228 B1 20010103; AR 008419 A1 20000119; BR 9702734 A 19980825; CA 2211605 A1 19980208; CA 2211605 C 19991019; CN 1103569 C 20030326; CN 1181914 A 19980520; DE 69703817 D1 20010208; DE 69703817 T2 20010426; ES 2155243 T3 20010501; FR 2752149 A1 19980213; FR 2752149 B1 19981016; JP 2911430 B2 19990623; JP H1075819 A 19980324; MX 9705642 A 19980228; US 2002069892 A1 20020613; US 6076534 A 20000620; US 6343608 B1 20020205; US 6619298 B2 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110712

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703817

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110711

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155243 T3

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703817 20010208

2001-01-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971223

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT