Global Patent Index - EP 0823233 A3

EP 0823233 A3 2000-04-19 - Support for reclining surfaces, particularly for mattresses

Title (en)

Support for reclining surfaces, particularly for mattresses

Title (de)

Auflage für Liegeflächen, insbesondere für Matratzen

Title (fr)

Support pour surfaces de repos, notamment pour matelas

Publication

EP 0823233 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97113210 A

Priority

AT 143196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823233A2] The support comprises two rails spaced apart, which are SIMILAR 1/4 or 1/5 of the length of the surface. Straps (14) are provided between the rails (1) and crossways to them. Successive fixture points of the straps in the longitudinal direction of the rails are located on a flat running S-shaped curve (5). The rails are connected to one another by at least one cross rib (2), the lower edge (4) of which runs beneath the rails. The S-shaped curve has its highest point in the longitudinal centre of the rails and runs out flatly downward at both longitudinal ends of the rails. The height of the rails is SIMILAR 50 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/02; A47C 23/24; A47C 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/00 (2006.01); A47C 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823233 A2 19980211; EP 0823233 A3 20000419; AT 404091 B 19980825; AT A143196 A 19980115

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-02-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI