Global Patent Index - EP 0823289 B1

EP 0823289 B1 2002-09-25 - METHOD OF MULTILAYER COATING

Title (en)

METHOD OF MULTILAYER COATING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MEHRSCHICHTBESCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT MULTICOUCHE

Publication

EP 0823289 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96912227 A

Priority

  • JP 9601119 W
  • JP 12733395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633814A1] A method of multilayer coating, comprising the steps of applying a cationic electrodeposition paint to a metallic object, heating and curing the paint, applying a first color base coat for covering the metallic surface, applying a second color base coat having transparency on the first coat before it is substantially cured, heating and curing both of the first and second color base coats, applying then a clear paint, and heating and curing it. According to this method, it is possible to form a multilayer paint coat that shows improvement in appearance, design, decorativeness, corrosion proofness, weatherability, chipping resistance and other physical properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/577 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633814 A1 19961031; CA 2219303 A1 19961031; DE 69623949 D1 20021031; DE 69623949 T2 20030220; EP 0823289 A1 19980211; EP 0823289 A4 19990609; EP 0823289 B1 20020925; KR 100412963 B1 20040403

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050425

2004-05-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623949 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HORIBE, KYOICHI KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KASUKAWA, TAKAHISA KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUME, MASAFUMI KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD.

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000426

1999-06-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19990422

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971028

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB