Global Patent Index - EP 0823393 B1

EP 0823393 B1 2001-01-31 - Traverse device having rotating wings

Title (en)

Traverse device having rotating wings

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung mit rotierenden Flügeln

Title (fr)

Bobinoir avec des ailes roulantes

Publication

EP 0823393 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97112174 A

Priority

JP 22313596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823393A1] A traverse device (U1) that is able to prevent the yarn from wrapping around the base of the rotating wing (2,3) when the yarn breaks, passes the return point (A,B) and is carried by the rotating wing. A heater (6) is arranged at a position past the return point, as a yarn cutting device for the yarn wound on the wing when a yarn break occurs and preferably, a yarn path restriction guide (8) is arranged such that the yarn passes the heater. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/71 (2006.01); B65H 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2839 (2013.01); B65H 54/71 (2013.01); B65H 63/003 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823393 A1 19980211; EP 0823393 B1 20010131; CN 1173458 A 19980218; DE 69704009 D1 20010308; DE 69704009 T2 20010906; JP 2867972 B2 19990310; JP H1045325 A 19980217; TW 351712 B 19990201

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704009 20010308

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000523

1998-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1998-10-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI