Global Patent Index - EP 0823503 B1

EP 0823503 B1 2002-11-20 - Top loading drum washing machine

Title (en)

Top loading drum washing machine

Title (de)

Mantelbeschickbare Trommelwaschmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à laver à tambour à chargement par le haut

Publication

EP 0823503 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113465 A

Priority

DE 19632008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823503A2] The top loading drum washing machine has a rotating drum (1)which is brought automatically into the loading position by a program control with the help of a positioning device. A locking device fixes the drum (1) in the loading position and consists of a locking trap and an engaging device that moves into the direction of the trap and is operated only after positioning has taken place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/302 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823503 A2 19980211; EP 0823503 A3 19981209; EP 0823503 B1 20021120; DE 19632008 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050805

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2004-10-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MIELE & CIE. KG

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708751 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI