Global Patent Index - EP 0823598 A3

EP 0823598 A3 2001-04-11 - In-ceiling type air conditioner having controller for upward and downward motion of elevating panel

Title (en)

In-ceiling type air conditioner having controller for upward and downward motion of elevating panel

Title (de)

Klimagerät für Deckenmontage mit Steuerung der Auf- und Abbewegung der Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de climatisation pour plafond avec commande de mouvement vers le haut et vers le bas du panneau élévateur

Publication

EP 0823598 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97113236 A

Priority

JP 22596296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823598A2] An in-ceiling type air conditioner (50) including an unit body (2) which contains a heat exchanger (16) and an air blower (10) and is mounted in the ceiling (1), a decorative panel (7) provided on the ceiling face, an elevating panel with an air filter (24) which is upwardly and downwardly moved by an elevating motor (140), a driver circuit for supplying an operating current to the elevating motor to rotate the elevating motor (140) forwardly and backwardly, a controller (160) for outputting a control signal to the driver circuit and controlling the driver circuit (305) on the basis of the control signal, a consumption current detector for detecting the consumption current (307) of the elevating motor (140) at all times to output a detection result to the controller (160), and a timer (309) for counting a predetermined time and outputting the count result to the controller (160). When the consumption current detected by the consumption current detector exceeds a predetermined value during the upward or downward motion of the elevating panel, the controller outputs an operation stop instruction to the driver circuit to stop the rotation of the elevating motor (140) and thus stop the elevating panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/0086 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0047 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 239 (M - 1601) 9 May 1994 (1994-05-09)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 492 (M - 1673) 14 September 1994 (1994-09-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823598 A2 19980211; EP 0823598 A3 20010411; EP 0823598 B1 20031119; CN 1100237 C 20030129; CN 1177707 A 19980401; DE 69726228 D1 20031224; DE 69726228 T2 20040902; ES 2212017 T3 20040716; JP 3552851 B2 20040811; JP H1054578 A 19980224; KR 100458541 B1 20050613; PT 823598 E 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-06-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040400195

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-02-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69726228

2015-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69726228

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140203

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212017 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400195

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69726228 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 11/00 A, 7F 24F 1/00 B

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT