Global Patent Index - EP 0823600 B1

EP 0823600 B1 2001-03-21 - Isothermal container with cold storage

Title (en)

Isothermal container with cold storage

Title (de)

Isothermischer Behälter mit Kältespeicher

Title (fr)

Conteneur isotherme avec réserve de frigories

Publication

EP 0823600 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420131 A

Priority

FR 9609850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823600A2] The cabinet (2) is of double-skinned, insulant-filled construction. The drawer (4), with similar front (12) and base (10), slides on internal grooves (3) above the storage zone (B), recesses (16) receiving the drawer front. Its rear edge (14) enters a similar groove (8). All grooves have flexible seals (15). Liquid CO2, injected through a filler (27) into the bag (26), which is restrained by a wire cage (17), forms a cryogenic mass of carbonic acid snow. Sublimed CO2 gas passes through the bag into an expansion zone (D) with draw-off conduit (29). After filling, entry and exit holes (27,29) are plugged. Optionally, the cage has a metal floor over a sliding panel, which is removed when frozen food is to be stored. Other variants are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823600 A2 19980211; EP 0823600 A3 19980715; EP 0823600 B1 20010321; DE 69704314 D1 20010426; DE 69704314 T2 20010705; ES 2155977 T3 20010601; FR 2752049 A1 19980206; FR 2752049 B1 19980911; GR 3036009 T3 20010928; PT 823600 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-07-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040126

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NORSK HYDRO ASA

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155977

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69704314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OLIVO, PIERRE

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980126

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI