Global Patent Index - EP 0823609 B1

EP 0823609 B1 2001-12-19 - A condenser for air-conditioning systems for vehicles

Title (en)

A condenser for air-conditioning systems for vehicles

Title (de)

Kondensator für Klimaanlage für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Condenseur pour système de conditionnement d'air pour véhicules

Publication

EP 0823609 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97112993 A

Priority

IT TO960683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823609A1] A condenser for air-conditioning systems for vehicles comprises at least one row of tubes (12, 12a, 12b) fixed to a pack of substantially flat fins (14) by mechanical expansion of the tubes (12). The condenser comprises a pair of tubes (12a, 12b) with circular cross-sections situated at the ends of the row and a plurality of tubes (12) with oblong cross-sections situated in the inner portion of the row. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/053; F25B 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F28D 1/05366 (2013.01); F28D 2021/007 (2013.01); F28F 2225/00 (2013.01); F28F 2275/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0823609 A1 19980211; EP 0823609 B1 20011219; AR 013316 A1 20001227; BR 9702735 A 19981027; DE 69709263 D1 20020131; DE 69709263 T2 20021024; ES 2169296 T3 20020701; IT 1284735 B1 19980521; IT TO960683 A1 19980209; JP H10160286 A 19980619; PL 185267 B1 20030430; PL 321312 A1 19980216; TR 199700724 A2 19980221

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060729

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060730

2006-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060729

2005-08-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169296 T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709263 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DENSO THERMAL SYSTEMS S.P.A.

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980801

1998-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI

1998-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI

1998-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNETI MARELLI CLIMATIZZAZIONE S.P.A.

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI