Global Patent Index - EP 0823754 B1

EP 0823754 B1 2000-02-02 - Current rail for terminal blocks, connectors and the like

Title (en)

Current rail for terminal blocks, connectors and the like

Title (de)

Stromschiene für Reihenklemmen, Klemmverbinder und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Rail de courant pour des blocs de jonction, connecteurs et similaires

Publication

EP 0823754 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113107 A

Priority

DE 29613738 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0823754A1] An electrical power rail for relays or connector terminals is produced as a metal pressing and has a pair connecting lugs (2) that provide a location for spring contact clips (3). The lower end of the rail has a formed contact pin (4) that locates in a connecting bush. The contact zone (5) of the pin is formed by deforming the material in opposite directions either side of the centre line (7) and so locally increases the pin width. Retaining pads (8) are formed for fitting the unit in a housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26; H01R 13/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/05 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2458 (2013.01); H01R 13/05 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29613738 U1 19960919; AT 189565 T 20000215; EP 0823754 A1 19980211; EP 0823754 B1 20000202; ES 2142125 T3 20000401

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701085

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142125 T3

2000-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701085 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189565 T 20000215

1999-10-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981216

1998-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970827

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI