Global Patent Index - EP 0823952 B1

EP 0823952 B1 2002-09-04 - ANCHORING DEVICE

Title (en)

ANCHORING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERANKERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE

Publication

EP 0823952 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97905311 A

Priority

  • GB 9700571 W
  • GB 9604298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9732088A1] An anchoring device (10) comprising a spike (11) for driving into the ground. A head portion (13) is located at the top of the spike (11) and an attachment loop (14) is secured to the anchoring device below the top and is moveable between a raised position in which a portion of the loop (14) projects above the top of the head portion (13) and a lowered position in which the loop lies below the top of the head portion. The loop (14) is placed in the lowered position when it is desired to drive the spike into the ground so that the top of the head portion may be struck with a hammer without damaging the loop (14). The loop may be placed in the raise position when it is desired to attach a chain or cable for tethering an article to the ground.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9732088 A1 19970904; DE 69715116 D1 20021010; EP 0823952 A1 19980218; EP 0823952 B1 20020904; GB 9604298 D0 19960501

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-12-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715116 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990325

1998-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB