Global Patent Index - EP 0823979 B1

EP 0823979 B1 2000-09-13 - WATCH CASE WITH A ROTARY RIM

Title (en)

WATCH CASE WITH A ROTARY RIM

Title (de)

UHRENGEHÄUSE MIT VERDREHBAREM GLASREIF

Title (fr)

BOITE DE MONTRE MUNIE D'UNE LUNETTE TOURNANTE

Publication

EP 0823979 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97903205 A

Priority

  • CH 9700087 W
  • CH 57196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733209A1] A watch with a rotary rim combined with an axial pawl system and a ring for fitting the rotary rim (2) onto the band (4) as well as centring, retaining and angularly positioning said rim. The ring (8) has a substantially U-shaped cross-section of which one inner side is engaged by the band while the other side has a projecting surface (20) on which the rim (2) is mounted. The pawls consist of flexible blades (26) cut out of the flat bottom wall (18) of the ring (8). The system is easy and inexpensive to manufacture and mount.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733209 A1 19970912; AU 1764497 A 19970922; AU 710017 B2 19990909; CH 690140 A5 20000515; CN 1145858 C 20040414; CN 1180421 A 19980429; DE 69703072 D1 20001019; DE 69703072 T2 20010510; EP 0823979 A1 19980218; EP 0823979 B1 20000913; HK 1009529 A1 20050208; JP 3759753 B2 20060329; JP H11505617 A 19990521; US 5822279 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703072

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100302

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050305

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-03-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050305

2005-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-03-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-12-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703072 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990907

1998-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE SWATCH GROUP MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT