Global patent index - EP 0824035 A3

EP 0824035 A3 2000-07-26 - Process and apparatus for producing foamed ceramic boards

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for producing foamed ceramic boards

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Formen von Platten aus Schaumkeramik

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication des panneaux en mousse céramique

Publication

EP 0824035 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97113888 A

Priority

  • DE 19632501 A
  • DE 19647250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824035A2] The process continuously forms e.g. ceramic tiles from a foamed ceramic mass (22). This is produced in a mixer (10) from clay slip and additives, and flows from an outlet (21) of the mixer, to be cast in moulds (4). The moulds are formed by a conveyor belt (2) running below the outlet. The edges of the belt are raised over a length starting before the inlet and ending some distance after it. Loose partitions (6) are held, spaced out, by the walls. The height of these partitions at least equals that of the slabs. Also claimed is the apparatus for the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 5/02; B28B 1/50; B28C 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/02 (2006.01); B01F 7/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/08 (2006.01); B28B 1/50 (2006.01); B28B 5/02 (2006.01); B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B28C 5/38 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/1269 (2013.01); B01F 7/022 (2013.01); B01F 7/045 (2013.01); B01F 7/086 (2013.01); B01F 15/0229 (2013.01); B28B 1/50 (2013.01); B28B 5/02 (2013.01); B28B 5/025 (2013.01); B01F 15/0201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824035 A2 19980218; EP 0824035 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status

2002-02-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010127

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28B 5/02 A, 7B 28B 1/50 B, 7B 28C 5/38 B

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAENDLE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANS LINGL ANLAGENBAU UND VERFAHRENSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT FUER ZIEGELFORSCHUNG ESSEN E.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE