Global Patent Index - EP 0824047 B1

EP 0824047 B1 2002-11-20 - Process and device for creating a relatively sharpedged depression in a workpiece during internal pression forming

Title (en)

Process and device for creating a relatively sharpedged depression in a workpiece during internal pression forming

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen einer verhältnismässig scharfkantigen Einsenkung an einem Werkstück bei der Innenhochdruckumformung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour réaliser sur une pièce une dépression aux bords sensiblement vifs lors du formage par pression interne

Publication

EP 0824047 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113478 A

Priority

DE 19632776 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824047A1] A form tool (1) is used, in which a part (9) formed as a die is controllably movable for formation of the cavity in the workpiece. A displaceable retainer (8,11) for the tool part is fitted in the form tool, preferably in an upper part. The retainer is arranged as a piston (8) in a prismatic or cylindrical hollow space (6) with a bush (7) made of low-friction material. In connection with the hollow space, a hydraulic cylinder unit (13), preferably provided with a path meter (17), is fitted to the outside of the form tool. The piston is fitted on the connecting rod (14) for the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/02 (2006.01); B21D 22/10 (2006.01); B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/033 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/205 (2013.01); B21D 22/025 (2013.01); B21D 22/105 (2013.01); B21D 26/033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824047 A1 19980218; EP 0824047 B1 20021120; DE 19644401 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060805

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060805

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708752 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000627

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANTON BAUER WEKZEUG- UND MASCHINENBAU GMBH & CO. K

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE