Global patent index - EP 0824064 B1

EP 0824064 B1 2000-03-01 - Pressing apparatus with a vertical axis of movement

Title (en)

Pressing apparatus with a vertical axis of movement

Title (de)

Pressvorrichtung mit einer vertikalen Bewegungsachse

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressurage à axe de déplacement vertical

Publication

EP 0824064 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97450019 A

Priority

FR 9609970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824064A1] A press consists of a frame (10) with two vertical columns (14), a pressure drive e.g. in the form of a power cylinder (32) with its body fixed to a cross-member (30) joined to the columns and its piston (36) carrying a pressing plate (38). The grapes to be pressed are put into a perforated cage (40) with a juice-receiving tray (26) mounted on a fixed plate (24). The press is equipped with a moving guard (18) with a transparent screen (48) which descends to surround the cage as the power cylinder's piston is operated, and locks (52) to engage with the cage when it reaches its lower position. The screen can be actuated by rotating screws inside the column, operated by an electric motor and reduction gear mechanism, or by a hydraulic or electric power cylinder or a pulley and cable system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824064 A1 19980218; EP 0824064 B1 20000301; DE 69701341 D1 20000406; ES 2144304 T3 20000601; FR 2751915 A1 19980206; FR 2751915 B1 19981030

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030912

2002-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144304

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990517

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT PT

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

1998-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970825

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT