Global patent index - EP 0824071 B1

EP 0824071 B1 2000-06-14 - Device for seizing a broken printing web

Title (en)

Device for seizing a broken printing web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fangen einer gerissenen Bedruckstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour saisir une bande d'impression déchirée

Publication

EP 0824071 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110608 A

Priority

DE 19629071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824071A1] The rotor arrangement (6) is pressable onto the roller (3) driven by a drive device (4) and is accommodated on a bearer (5) movable by an operating device activated in the event of a strip tear. The operating device contains at least one pneumatic cylinder (12), which for adjustment of the rotor arrangement can be applied to the roller at high pressure. It also applies the rotor arrangement to the roller with reduced pressure. The pneumatic cylinder to which compressed air is applied in the drive direction, after the fulfilment of a drive function, is connectable to an expansion chamber (19). The volume of the expansion chamber corresponds to the stroke volume of the pneumatic cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/18; B65H 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/06 (2006.01); B41F 33/18 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/025 (2013.01); B41F 33/06 (2013.01); B41F 33/18 (2013.01); B65H 2515/342 (2013.01); B65H 2555/11 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/342 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629071 C1 19980212; EP 0824071 A1 19980218; EP 0824071 B1 20000614; JP H10114056 A 19980506; US 5931092 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701875

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701875

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040628

2003-05-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701875

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GRAFOTEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990726

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980514

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT