Global Patent Index - EP 0824083 B1

EP 0824083 B1 2000-03-29 - Device for removing sheets from a pile and for transporting the sheets away from the pile

Title (en)

Device for removing sheets from a pile and for transporting the sheets away from the pile

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abnahme von Bogen von einem Stapel und zum Transport der Bogen weg vom Stapel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever des feuilles d'une pile et pour transporter les feuilles loin de la pile

Publication

EP 0824083 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112546 A

Priority

DE 19632657 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632657C1] The device includes a guide block (11) fixed on the frame side and has a guide face (16) for the toothed belt (15). The web (34) of the guide block (11) is curved on its top side (19) opposite the guide face (16) like the circumferential face of the discs (32,33). In the interspace between the discs is a segment (40) swivelling coaxial with same. The circumferential face (41) of the segment facing the top of the web of the guide block matches the curvature of the top side (19) of the web (34). The suction opening (18) is formed radially in the segment and is connected to an axial suction channel (42) in the axis (30) supporting the disc (33) remote from the frame. The disc (32) near the frame is mounted on the axis of a swivel sleeve which has the segment fixed at one end and the lockable setting element (45) at the other. The suction opening (18) opens centrally in the recess (48) in the circumferential face of the segment aligned with the recess (20) in the guide block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/12; B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/12 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/124 (2013.01); B65H 5/224 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632657 C1 19970918; EP 0824083 A2 19980218; EP 0824083 A3 19980930; EP 0824083 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010719

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010702

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990428

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990126

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI