Global Patent Index - EP 0824176 B1

EP 0824176 B1 2003-06-18 - Door check for a motor vehicle door or hatch

Title (en)

Door check for a motor vehicle door or hatch

Title (de)

Feststellvorrichtung für eine Tür oder eine Klappe eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'arrêt pour une porte ou un hayon d'un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0824176 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111588 A

Priority

DE 19632630 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824176A1] An end-side stop is provided, and there is an accommodation part with two rotatably located bearing rollers locating on the door holding bar. At least one bearing roller is pressed by the effect of springs against the door holding bar. The springs are covered at least partly by a plastics cover connected to the accommodation part. The stop of the door holding bar in its end position works in conjunction with a damping-elastic locating part. The locating part (16) is formed in a one-piece construction on the cover (15). On the end sections of the bearing bolt (9) of the immovable bearing roller (11) located on the accommodation part (7) a locating part is fitted. The locating parts run at a parallel distance from one another and are formed in one piece on the cover produced by injection moulding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/22; B60J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824176 A1 19980218; EP 0824176 B1 20030618; DE 19632630 A1 19980219; DE 19632630 C2 19980910

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060709

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060709

2005-09-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050707

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710295 P 20030724

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971121

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB