Global Patent Index - EP 0824252 B1

EP 0824252 B1 2000-11-08 - Segmented illuminated display, particularly for use in controlling a cooker

Title (en)

Segmented illuminated display, particularly for use in controlling a cooker

Title (de)

Leuchtschrift-Segmentanzeige, insbesondere für eine Herdsteuerung

Title (fr)

Indicateur segmenté pour inscription lumineuse, spécialement pour la commande d'une cuisinière

Publication

EP 0824252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113352 A

Priority

  • DE 19632848 A
  • DE 29614981 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824252A1] The display is configured in various formats using a number of matrix type LCD display cells. The information fed to the display cells is provided by a slave microcontroller (SMC) that is coupled by an interface (SS) to a master micro-controller (MMC). The master controller provides an interface protocol for the specific display configuration with single control commands for the specific single segments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/30; G09G 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/302 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/302 (2013.01); G09F 9/3023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824252 A1 19980218; EP 0824252 B1 20001108; ES 2153626 T3 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080802

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080802

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153626 T3

2001-01-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702592 20001214

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT