Global Patent Index - EP 0824262 B1

EP 0824262 B1 2002-11-20 - Snap action switch with casing

Title (en)

Snap action switch with casing

Title (de)

Schnappschalter mit Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Commutateur à action brusque avec boîtier

Publication

EP 0824262 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113571 A

Priority

DE 29614028 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824262A1] The switch has a contact bridge (10) with two switch positions operated by a pin (2) for electrically connecting at least a first and second contact pair (23,24) in the first and second positions respectively. The action line of a snap spring arm (8,9) can be displaced to snap the contact bridge from the first to the second position. Stop edges (25,26), arranged offset wrt. the spring arms' action line (A,B) on both sides of the actuating pin, contact a stop region (27,28) of the contact bridge if one of the spring arms breaks. This causes the action line of the intact spring arm to tilt the contact bridge about the stop edge, thus blocking the first and/or second switch position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/02 (2006.01); H01H 3/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29614028 U1 19971211; EP 0824262 A1 19980218; EP 0824262 B1 20021120; JP 2911855 B2 19990623; JP H10144176 A 19980529

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170805

2017-08-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708753

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708753 20030102

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHALTBAU GMBH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

1998-10-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971121

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT