Global patent index - EP 0824446 A4

EP 0824446 A4 2000-04-12 - MOORING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

MOORING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

VERANKERUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT D'AMARRAGE

Publication

EP 0824446 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96912685 A

Priority

  • GB 9507826 A
  • GB 9519491 A
  • US 9604997 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633089A1] A new type of mooring arrangement is invented by providing conventional catenary spread mooring systems, taut leg spread mooring systems and tension leg platform mooring systems with additional branch lines (2-2; 3-3) and branch connections (2, 3). These can be used to modify technical characteristics of the invented mooring arrangement and to modify global and local loads in comparison with those in conventional systems. By novel, optimal arrangements of branch connections this invention allows to enhance the functionality of mooring systems and makes them more cost effective at increased water depths. This invention makes it feasible to significantly reduce total foot prints of mooring systems and reduce total weight of mooring components used in those systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/00; B63B 21/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633089 A1 19961024; EP 0824446 A1 19980225; EP 0824446 A4 20000412; MX 9708864 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAJNIKONIS, KRZYSZTOF JAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WAJNIKONIS, KRZYSZTOF JAN

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 63B 21/00 A, 7B 63B 21/50 B

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971113

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT