Global patent index - EP 0824449 B1

EP 0824449 B1 2000-06-14 - METHOD OF OPTIMIZING THE EFFICIENCY OF SHIPS WITH BOW AND STERN PROPELLERS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ADJUSTING THE SPEED OF ROTATION OF THE BOW PROPELLER

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPTIMIZING THE EFFICIENCY OF SHIPS WITH BOW AND STERN PROPELLERS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ADJUSTING THE SPEED OF ROTATION OF THE BOW PROPELLER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES WIRKUNGSGRADES BEI SCHIFFEN MIT BUG- UND HECKPROPELLER SOWIE ANORDNUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER DREHZAHL DES BUGPROPELLERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DU RENDEMENT DE BATEAUX EQUIPES D'HELICES DE PROUE ET DE POUPE, ET SYSTEME POUR AJUSTER LA VITESSE DE ROTATION DE L'HELICE DE PROUE

Publication

EP 0824449 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96902895 A

Priority

DE 9600307 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730892A1] The invention concerns a method of optimizing the efficiency of ships with bow and stern propellers and an arrangement for adjusting the speed of rotation of the bow propeller. Ferry boats in particular can have identical drives at the bows and the stern in order to avoid their having to turn when changing their direction of travel. Generally, during travel, the speed of rotation of the front propeller is slower than that of the rear propeller. According to the invention, in order to optimize efficiency, the total of the absorbed active power of the two drive systems is controlled so as to be at a minimum value. An associated arrangement comprises a controller (10) of which the input variables are formed by the active power of the two drive systems, the bow propeller speed of rotation at which the active power total is a minimum being determined in the controller (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/22; B63H 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 5/08 (2006.01); B63H 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 5/08 (2013.01); B63H 21/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730892 A1 19970828; DK 0824449 T3 20001106; EP 0824449 A1 19980225; EP 0824449 B1 20000614

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-02-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040205

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK SE

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990812

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971022

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK SE