Global Patent Index - EP 0824460 B1

EP 0824460 B1 2000-03-22 - PUNCHED BLANK FOR A TRAY-LIKE PACKAGING

Title (en)

PUNCHED BLANK FOR A TRAY-LIKE PACKAGING

Title (de)

AUSGESTANZTER ZUSCHNITT FÜR EINE SCHALENFÖRMIGE VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

DECOUPE DESTINEE A UN EMBALLAGE DU TYPE PLATEAU

Publication

EP 0824460 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96914113 A

Priority

  • EP 9601713 W
  • SE 9501549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633915A1] The invention relates to a punched blank for a tray-like package. It comprises a bottom part (1), two long sides (2) and two short sides (3) in one piece with the bottom part (1) and marked with respect to this by fold lines (6, 7). The long and short sides (2, 3) are intended to be folded up and united with each other at the ends. The invention is characterized in that the fold lines (7) between the bottom part (1) and at least the long sides (2) are directed inwardly at the ends and form an angle between the middle part (6) of the fold lines of 2-20 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/2019 (2013.01); B65D 5/2023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633915 A1 19961031; AT 190940 T 20000415; AU 5760996 A 19961118; DE 69607340 D1 20000427; DE 69607340 T2 20001116; DK 0824460 T3 20000821; EP 0824460 A1 19980225; EP 0824460 B1 20000322; ES 2147923 T3 20001001; FI 974054 A0 19971024; FI 974054 A 19971117; NO 974919 A 19971212; NO 974919 D0 19971024; PT 824460 E 20000929; SE 508005 C2 19980810; SE 9501549 D0 19950427; SE 9501549 L 19961028; TR 9701263 T1 19980221

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070425

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCA PACKAGING MARKETING N.V.

- Effective date: 20060430

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060426

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-01-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-10-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-05-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-04-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060425

2005-04-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-19 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050415

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SCA PACKAGING MARKETING NV

2002-05-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: SCA PACKAGING MARKETING NV BE

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-05-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-03-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCA PACKAGING HOLDING B.V. TRANSFER- SCA PACKAGING

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147923 T3

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607340 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190940 T 20000415

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980218

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT