Global Patent Index - EP 0824484 B1

EP 0824484 B1 2002-09-04 - CARTRIDGE FOR FLUID PRODUCTS

Title (en)

CARTRIDGE FOR FLUID PRODUCTS

Title (de)

KARTUSCHE FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGE MEDIEN

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE POUR PRODUITS FLUIDES

Publication

EP 0824484 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97907061 A

Priority

  • DE 19608128 A
  • DE 29622174 U
  • DE 29622175 U
  • EP 9701022 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9731840A2] The object of the invention is a cartridge (1) which is economical to manufacture and, also, to fill, only has a small amount of plastic and, when disposed of, causes a low level of pollution. In addition, it should be possible to use said cartridge in as many ways as possible, to empty out residues therein as far as possible, and to provide a great transportation volume. To this end, a cartridge (1) for flowable media is provided which has a volume-limiting envelope (2) made of flexible material. Said cartridge is provided at one end with a plunger-shaped press-out member (4) and at a second end with an outlet member (3). There is in the region of the outlet a dispensing opening the diameter of which, taking into account the forces which can be applied by the press-out member, the viscosity of the flowable medium and the flexibility of the envelope, ensures in the volume limited by the envelope an internal pressure which is suitable to counteract folding of the envelope material into the volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00586 (2013.01); B05C 17/00569 (2013.01); B05C 17/00576 (2013.01); B05C 17/01 (2013.01); B05C 17/0103 (2013.01); B65D 47/06 (2013.01); B65D 83/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9731840 A2 19970904; WO 9731840 A3 19971127; CA 2220030 A1 19970904; CN 1099361 C 20030122; CN 1188458 A 19980722; EP 0824484 A1 19980225; EP 0824484 B1 20020904; ES 2180944 T3 20030216; JP H11504600 A 19990427; US 6000582 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2006-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180944 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708110 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CARTRIDGE FOR FLUID PRODUCTS

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSTMANN, FRANK

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990909

1998-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FORSTMANN, FRANK

1998-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUC CARLIER

1998-03-18 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971010

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE