Global Patent Index - EP 0824485 B1

EP 0824485 B1 2000-08-09 - TABLET PACKAGING BOX

Title (en)

TABLET PACKAGING BOX

Title (de)

TABLETTEN-VERPACKUNGSSCHACHTEL

Title (fr)

BOITE D'EMBALLAGE POUR TABLETTES

Publication

EP 0824485 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96911984 A

Priority

  • DE 29506540 U
  • EP 9601423 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2174695A1] A packaging-type tablet dispenser consists of two major sections connected by a thin plastic hinge joint and made in a single injection molding step. After the box is filled with its intended contents, a closing cap is engaged with the container portion of the dispenser which correctly and automatically positions itself in one of two desired positions: one of which is the closed position and the other of which is a dispensing position. A clearly discernible click noise is generated as the cap is moved to each of the defined positions. The packaging box can be operated single-handedly and the tablets can be seen in the dispensing chamber before being removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0409 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29506540 U1 19950831; AU 5498996 A 19961118; CA 2174695 A1 19961024; CN 1074378 C 20011107; CN 1182401 A 19980520; DE 19680282 D2 19990311; EP 0824485 A1 19980225; EP 0824485 B1 20000809; JP 3597928 B2 20041208; JP H08295375 A 19961112; KR 100353759 B1 20030821; RU 2202503 C2 20030420; WO 9633927 A1 19961031

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 17.12.2001 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2001-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000809

2001-01-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605720 20000914

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOH, DJING SAN

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOH, DJING SAN

1999-06-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TABLET PACKAGING BOX

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981130

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971028

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL