Global patent index - EP 0824626 B1

EP 0824626 B1 2000-01-12 - DRILLING TOOL

Title (en)

DRILLING TOOL

Title (de)

BOHRWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 0824626 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96914085 A

Priority

  • DE 9600868 W
  • DE 19516270 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9635856A1] Described is a drilling tool with a head whose end faces the direction of advance and has a main cutting face which forms a drilling point lying in the axis of the drill and slopes back on each side essentially in the shape of a roof, the main cutting face also having chip-removal grooves. The tool is characterized in that the main cutting face has a primary cutting edge, which extends radially along at least one side of the main cutting face, and a secondary cutting edge which extends radially along essentially the remaining length of the main cutting face and is set back longitudinally, in the direction opposite to the direction of advance with respect to the primary cutting edge by at least the distance in millimeters which the drill advances per rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/58 (2013.01); Y10T 408/905 (2013.01); Y10T 408/909 (2013.01); Y10T 408/9097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9635856 A1 19961114; AT 188760 T 20000115; DE 19516270 C1 19970130; DK 0824626 T3 20000529; EP 0824626 A1 19980225; EP 0824626 B1 20000112; US 6032750 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: ITW HELLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59604177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: ITW HELLER GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC., GLENVIEW, ILL., US

- Effective date: 20140618

2014-07-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD, JAN, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140618

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2014-06-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: ITW HELLER GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC., US

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: FALLSGASSE 7, 9492 ESCHEN (LI)

2012-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOGENSBERGER PATENT- AND MARKENBUERO DR. BURKH, LI

2009-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

- Free Format Text: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.#3600 WEST LAKE AVENUE#GLENVIEW (IL 60025-5811) (US) -TRANSFER TO- ILLINOISTOOL WORKS INC.#3600 WEST LAKE AVENUE#GLENVIEW (IL 60025-5811) (US)

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-01-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2003-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

- Free Format Text: GEBRUEDER HELLER DINKLAGE GMBH#STEINFELDER STRASSE 11#49413 DINKLAGE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.#3600 WEST LAKE AVENUE#GLENVIEW (IL 60025-5811) (US)

2002-01-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2000-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBRUDER HELLER DINKLAGE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-11-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000525

- Year of fee payment: 05

2000-05-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-05-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188760

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980219

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971027

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE