Global Patent Index - EP 0824664 B1

EP 0824664 B1 2001-01-10 - ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH SLIDING SHOES

Title (en)

ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH SLIDING SHOES

Title (de)

UMLAUFENDER REGENERATIVER WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT GLEITSCHUHEN

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ROTATIF POURVU DE PATINS COULISSANTS

Publication

EP 0824664 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96911148 A

Priority

  • SE 9600484 W
  • SE 9501445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633381A1] A rotary regenerative heat exchanger has a rotor containing a regenerative mass and rotating in a stationary casing. Movable sector plates (6, 8) are arranged at each end of the rotor at a short distance (S) therefrom in order to sealingly separate media ducts. Each sector plate (6, 8) is supported by a pair of support means (10) including sliding shoes (17), which slide on an end surface (11) on a flange (9) at the outer periphery of each rotor end. Portions of the rotor flange (9) might slant, causing misalignment of the sliding shoes (17). According to the invention this problem is overcome in that each sliding shoe (17) is movably mounted in the sector plate (6) allowing the sliding shoe (17) to tilt around a tilting point (0) so that the sliding shoe (17) adapts to the local deviations of the end surface (11) on the rotor flange (9) from the plane perpendicular to the rotor axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633381 A1 19961024; AT 198666 T 20010115; DE 69611522 D1 20010215; DE 69611522 T2 20010719; EP 0824664 A1 19980225; EP 0824664 B1 20010110; ES 2155934 T3 20010601; PL 181381 B1 20010731; PL 322818 A1 19980216; SE 505618 C2 19970922; SE 9501445 D0 19950420; SE 9501445 L 19961021

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-12-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-04-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155934 T3

2001-04-11 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010411

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611522 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI GB SE

2001-01-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198666 T 20010115

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROTARY REGENERATIVE HEAT EXCHANGER WITH SLIDING SHOES

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB AIR PREHEATER, INC.

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971003

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI GB SE