Global Patent Index - EP 0824739 B1

EP 0824739 B1 2000-09-13 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING REFRIGERATING ELEMENTS AND SAID REFRIGERATING ELEMENTS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING REFRIGERATING ELEMENTS AND SAID REFRIGERATING ELEMENTS

Title (de)

AUSGABEAUTOMAT FÜR KÜHLELEMENTE UND ENTSPRECHENDE KÜHLELEMENTE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR D'ELEMENTS REFRIGERANTS ET LESDITS ELEMENTS REFRIGERANTS

Publication

EP 0824739 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97908319 A

Priority

  • FR 9700404 W
  • FR 9603192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734264A1] An apparatus for dispensing refrigerating elements enabling users to avoid breaking the cold chain when buying fresh and frozen produce. The apparatus (101) for dispensing refrigerating elements (11) includes a housing (102) with an inlet (104) in the upper portion (129) thereof for inserting a refrigerating element (11) to be recycled, and an outlet (105) in the lower portion (128) of the housing for dispensing a refrigerating element (11) loaded with negative kilocalories, and at least one refrigerated storage unit (107) provided with a helical storage and guide rail (108) extending substantially between the two portions (128, 129) so that the refrigerating elements (11) move down into the lower portion (128) during storage. A cleaning device (112) for cleaning the refrigerating elements (11) to be recycled comprises rotary brushes (113) that urge said elements from the inlet (104) towards the storage unit (107). Similarly, an actuator (121) is provided for urging a refrigerating element (11) loaded with negative kilocalories from the storage unit (107) towards the outlet (105). The apparatus is particularly useful for dispensing foods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06; G07F 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 16/00 (2006.01); F25D 25/04 (2006.01); G07F 7/06 (2006.01); G07F 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 9/10 (2006.01); G07F 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 11/16 (2006.01); G07F 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2013.01); F25D 16/00 (2013.01); F25D 25/04 (2013.01); G07F 9/105 (2013.01); G07F 11/36 (2013.01); F25D 2303/0822 (2013.01); F25D 2303/08222 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734264 A1 19970918; AT 196379 T 20000915; AU 2031397 A 19971001; AU 710304 B2 19990916; CA 2221049 A1 19970918; CA 2221049 C 20060815; DE 69703073 D1 20001019; DE 69703073 T2 20010503; EP 0824739 A1 19980225; EP 0824739 B1 20000913; ES 2154029 T3 20010316; FR 2745933 A1 19970912; FR 2745933 B1 19980612; JP 4016401 B2 20071205; JP H11508075 A 19990713; PT 824739 E 20010330; US 6056152 A 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FRIODIS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-04-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRIODIS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69703073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130218

2013-04-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69703073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUNK, LUDWIG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130218

2012-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRIODIS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-07-30 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20100413

2010-04-16 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Ref Legal Event Code: NF4A

- Free Format Text: RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20100413

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-09-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2006-10-06 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-07-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: TECHNI LOISIRS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2006-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TECHNI-LOISIRS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: INDUSTRIE ET FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2001-06-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: INDUSTRIE ET FINANCE S.A. FR

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-06-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: INDUSTRIE ET FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154029

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INDUSTRIE ET FINANCE S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LEONETTI, PHILIPPE TRANSFER- INDUSTRIE ET FINANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. FRANCO CICOGNA

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196379

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990702

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971025

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE