Global patent index - EP 0824882 A3

EP 0824882 A3 2000-03-15 - A seat and/or backrest for foldable furniture, particularly for garden or camping furniture

Title (en)

A seat and/or backrest for foldable furniture, particularly for garden or camping furniture

Title (de)

Sitz- und/oder Lehnenteil von Klappmöbeln, insbesondere Garten- oder Campingmöbeln

Title (fr)

Siège et/ou dossier pour des meubles pliants, notamment des meubles de jardin ou de camping

Publication

EP 0824882 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110079 A

Priority

  • CA 2216212 A
  • DE 19634201 A
  • DE 19636312 A
  • US 93442897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0824882A2] The frame (2) covered by an especially textile cover (35) has hollow plastics or metal, especially aluminium profiled sections (20-24) open at at least one end side and with a lengthwise slot through which the cover is inserted. The distance between the hollow sections determines the width or length of the seat or backrest. The edges of the cover are held inside the hollow sections by piping whose diameter is greater than the width of the lengthwise slots in the hollow sections. The hollow sections of a seat or backrest part (17,18) are joined to form a stable, self-supporting frame, by crossbars (14-16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 31/02; A47C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 5/06 (2006.01); A47C 7/22 (2006.01); A47C 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/282 (2013.01); A47C 5/06 (2013.01); A47C 31/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0824882 A2 19980225; EP 0824882 A3 20000315; CA 2216212 A1 19990322; DE 19636312 A1 19980226; DE 19636312 C2 19980903; US 6030040 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI