Global Patent Index - EP 0825003 A3

EP 0825003 A3 2000-03-01 - Milling machine with rotating tool for stonelike materials

Title (en)

Milling machine with rotating tool for stonelike materials

Title (de)

Fräsmaschine mit rotierendem Fräswerkzeug für gesteinsartige Materialien

Title (fr)

Machine de fraisage à outil rotatif pour le travail de matériaux pierreux

Publication

EP 0825003 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97111710 A

Priority

  • DE 19631659 A
  • DE 19634069 A
  • DE 19636869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825003A2] The milling machine has a rotating milling tool with a number of milling chisels (2) around its circumference. A hammering action is induced in one or all of the chisel points through a pneumatic or hydraulic hammering mechanism. The hammering mechanism may comprise pistons (1) enclosed in cylinders (11) and operated by compressed air. The cylinder ends are alternately connected to the air feed and air exhaust sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4331362 A 19820525 - TALBERT CARROLL G

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0825003 A2 19980225; EP 0825003 A3 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-12-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI