Global Patent Index - EP 0825126 B1

EP 0825126 B1 2001-12-05 - Dispensing package for hygroscopic tablets

Title (en)

Dispensing package for hygroscopic tablets

Title (de)

Spenderpackung für hygroskopische Tabletten

Title (fr)

Emballage pour comprimés hygroscopiques

Publication

EP 0825126 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113533 A

Priority

DE 19632764 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825126A1] The lid (12) of the box has a crease line (17) running parallel to the lid's front edge, and from each end point of the crease line extends a perforation line which continues over the adjacent side walls (13,15). The portion of the upper section which is located in front of the crease line and perforation lines is detachably connected to the lower section. A dust flap (16) is hinged on the front edge of a section of each of the lid's side walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/54; B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/54 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/6682 (2013.01); B65D 5/545 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632764 A1 19980219; AT 210049 T 20011215; DK 0825126 T3 20020311; EP 0825126 A1 19980225; EP 0825126 B1 20011205; ES 2169297 T3 20020701; PT 825126 E 20020531

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210049 T

- Effective date: 20170806

2017-08-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705635

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090304

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-05-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-05-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-05-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090301

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-02-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090206

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070805

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070801

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400919

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169297 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-11 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705635 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210049 T 20011215

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970806

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI