Global patent index - EP 0825150 B1

EP 0825150 B1 2000-01-05 - Auxiliary device for horse riding or lunging

Title (en)

Auxiliary device for horse riding or lunging

Title (de)

Hilfsmittel zum Reiten und zur Longierkontrolle

Title (fr)

Dispositif auxiliaire pour la monte à cheval et le travail à la longe

Publication

EP 0825150 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111153 A

Priority

DE 19633116 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0825150A1] The device assists in riding a horse and controlling it on a lunge rein. The elongated device has an eye (1,2) at each end. The two eyes are connected by two curved bars which leave spaces between them the first or forward bar (3) is plain and has a curvature slightly less than that of the second or rearward bar (4). There are eyes (5,6) on this bar, positioned to divide it into three approximately equal sections. A third curved bar (7) extends out of the plane of the first two.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68B 1/00 (2013.01); B68B 2001/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633116 A1 19980219; AT 188451 T 20000115; EP 0825150 A1 19980225; EP 0825150 B1 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030703

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2000-11-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59700954

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188451

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

1999-10-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR HORSE RIDING OR LUNGING

1999-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: AUXILIARY DEVICE FOR HORSE RIDING OR LUNGING

1998-11-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

1998-11-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980801

1998-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

1998-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI